IL SB2878 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Police Act and the Illinois Police Training Act creating the Annie LeGere Law. Provides that the Department of State Police and the Illinois Law Enforcement Training Standards Board may conduct or approve training programs for officers to recognize and respond to anaphylaxis including the administration of an epinephrine auto-injector. Provides that the Department of State Police or a local governmental agency may authorize officers to carry, administer, or assist in the administration of epinephrine auto-injectors if they have completed the requiring training and provide for written policies on the use of epinephrine auto-injectors. Limits liability for use of epinephrine auto-injectors by police officers. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement.
Title
POLICE-EPINEPHRINE ADMIN-TRAIN
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-31 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 13, 2016 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 20, 2016 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Nybo |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 005-000-000 |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chris Nybo |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 7, 2016 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Public Health; 009-000-000 |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chris Nybo |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chris Nybo |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Public Health |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chris Nybo |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chris Nybo |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2610 | 40 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 805 | 8.40 | New Code | See Bill Text |
410 | 620 | 3.21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 705 | 10.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |