IL SB2877 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-21 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Barber, Cosmetology, Esthetics, Hair Braiding, and Nail Technology Act of 1985. Provides that an applicant for licensure as a barber or teacher of barbering may take the licensure examination after completing 1,200 hours in the study of barbering. Provides that an applicant for licensure as a cosmetologist or teacher of cosmetology may take the licensure examination after completing 1,200 hours in the study of cosmetology. Provides that an applicant for licensure as an esthetician or teacher of esthetics may take the licensure examination after completing 600 hours in the study of esthetics. Provides that an applicant for licensure as a nail technician or teacher of nail technology may take the licensure examination after completing 280 hours in the study of nail technology.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

BARBER/COSMETOLOGY-EXAMINATION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-21SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-05-21HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-000-000
2018-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 007-000-000
2018-05-02HouseAssigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
2018-04-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-24HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-23HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-23HouseArrived in House
2018-04-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 045-000-000
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateDo Pass as Amended Licensed Activities and Pensions; 008-000-000
2018-04-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2018-03-01SenatePostponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-14SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-14SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2254102-7Amended CodeCitation Text
2254103-6Amended CodeCitation Text
2254103A-5Amended CodeCitation Text
2254103C-7Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback