IL SB2872 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of State Police Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department of State Police is divided into the Office of the Statewide 9-1-1 Administrator (removes the Illinois State Police Academy) and 5 divisions (rather than 4 divisions): the Division of Patrol (rather than the Division of Operations), the Division of Investigation, the Division of Forensic Services, the Division of Administration, and the Division of Internal Investigation. Provides that for each Division, the Director of State Police shall appoint one Deputy Director and one Assistant Deputy Director. Provides that the position of Deputy Director may be given an appointed rank of Colonel and the Assistant Deputy Director may be given an appointed rank of Lieutenant Colonel. Eliminates the Office of Coordination of Gang Prevention in the Division of Operations. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STATE POLICE ORGANIZATION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-25SenatePostponed - State Government
2018-04-19SenatePostponed - State Government
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-04-12SenatePostponed - State Government
2018-04-04SenatePostponed - State Government
2018-03-01SenatePostponed - State Government
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to State Government
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-14SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-14SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson

Code Citations


Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback