IL SB2871 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act. Provides that the Department of State Police may develop a system under which the holder of a Firearm Owner's Identification Card may display an electronic version of his or her Firearm Owner's Identification Card on a mobile telephone or other portable electronic device. Provides that an electronic version of a Firearm Owner's Identification Card shall contain security features the Department determines to be necessary to ensure that the electronic version is accurate and current and shall satisfy other requirements the Department determines to be necessary regarding form and content. Provides that the display or possession of an electronic version of a valid Firearm Owner's Identification Card in accordance with the requirements of the Department satisfies all requirements for the display or possession of a valid Firearm Owner's Identification Card under the laws of the State. Amends the Firearm Concealed Carry Act. Provides that the Department of State Police may develop a system under which the holder of a concealed carry license may display an electronic version of his or her license on a mobile telephone or other portable electronic device. Provides that an electronic version of a license shall contain security features the Department determines to be necessary to ensure that the electronic version is accurate and current and shall satisfy other requirements the Department determines to be necessary regarding form and content. Provides that the display or possession of an electronic version of a license in accordance with the requirements of the Department satisfies all requirements for the display or possession of a valid license under the laws of this State. Makes conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ELECTRONIC FIREARM LICENSES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-03-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2018-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2018-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2018-03-14SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-02-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-02-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-02-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2018-02-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-14SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-14SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
430652Amended CodeCitation Text
430653Amended CodeCitation Text
430656.2New CodeSee Bill Text
4306611New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback