IL SB2868 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on August 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates an income tax checkoff for contributions to the Hunger Relief Fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INC TX-HUNGER RELIEF FUND

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-21SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1014
2018-08-21SenateEffective Date January 1, 2019
2018-08-21SenateGovernor Approved
2018-06-22SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-05-25SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-25HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 048-000-000
2018-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018
2018-04-23SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateDo Pass Revenue; 005-000-000
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Revenue
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-14SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-14SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
355507IIINew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback