IL SB2866 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Communicable Disease Prevention Act. Provides that the Department must provide all students (currently, all female students) who are entering sixth grade and their parents or legal guardians written information about the link between human papillomavirus and specified kinds of cancer, and the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention's recommendation for children to be vaccinated with the HPV vaccine (currently, written information about the link between human papillomavirus and cervical cancer and the availability of a HPV vaccine). Provides that the Department shall adopt emergency rules to the extent necessary to administer the Department's responsibilities under the amendatory Act no later than July 1, 2019. Amends the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that beginning on January 1, 2020, the definition for "eligible individual" for provisions concerning human papillomavirus vaccinations includes male children under the age of 18 that meet specified conditions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HPV-INFORMATION-VACCINATIONS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Holmes
2018-04-17SenateFiscal Note Requested - Withdrawn by Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2018-04-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-03-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-03-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 008-000-000
2018-03-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Public Health
2018-03-13SenateFiscal Note Requested by Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2018-03-13SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2018-03-13SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2018-03-12SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-12SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-03-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-02-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 28, 2018
2018-02-27SenateDo Pass Public Health; 009-000-000
2018-02-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Public Health
2018-02-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-02-26SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-26SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-02-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-02-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-02-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-02-22SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Public Health
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-14SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-14SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2023102310-617Amended CodeCitation Text
4103152eAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback