IL SB2865 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Administrative Act and the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that the Department of Human Services shall progressively increase rates and reimbursements so that by July 1, 2018 direct support persons earn a base wage of not less than $5.25 per hour above the highest of the federal, State, county, or municipal minimum wages, and so that other front-line personnel earn a commensurate wage, and by July 1, 2020 direct support persons earn a base wage of not less than $6.75 per hour above the highest of the federal, State, county, or municipal minimum wages. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DEV DISABILITIES WORKERS-WAGES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-11SenatePostponed - Human Services
2018-03-14SenatePostponed - Human Services
2018-03-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-02-27SenatePostponed - Human Services
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Human Services
2018-02-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-14SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-14SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20170555.5New CodeSee Bill Text
30555-5.4jNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback