IL SB2863 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Employer's Liability Rates Article of the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that a rate is excessive if it is likely to produce a long run profit that is unreasonably high for the insurance provided or if expenses are unreasonably high in relation to the services rendered. Makes changes regarding competitive markets exists and disapproval of rates under specified circumstances. Amends the Workers' Compensation Act. Provides that accidental injuries sustained while traveling to or from work do not arise out of and in the course of employment. Permits an employer to file with the Illinois Workers' Compensation Commission a workers' compensation safety program or a workers' compensation return to work program implemented by the employer. Provides that (i) injuries to the shoulder shall be considered injuries to part of the arm and (ii) injuries to the hip shall be considered injuries to part of the leg. Contains provisions concerning repetitive and cumulative injuries; permanent partial disability determinations; annual reports by the Commission concerning self-insurance for workers' compensation in Illinois; and duties of the Workers' Compensation Premium Rates Task Force. Makes additional changes to the Workers' Compensation Act. Provides for an evidence-based drug formulary. Requires an annual investigation of procedures covered for ambulatory surgical centers and the establishment of a fee schedule. Changes a waiting period for benefits for certain firefighters, emergency medical technicians, and paramedics. Changes compensation computations for subsequent injuries to the same part of the spine. Effective immediately.
Title
UNEMP INS-WRKR COMP RATES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 34 N: 21 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-01-06 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2018-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-23 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-05-21 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2018-05-21 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-05-21 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Do Pass / Standard Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 016-012-000 |
2018-04-26 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2018-04-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-18 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-17 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2018-04-17 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 034-021-000 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 13, 2018 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 28, 2018 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 007-004-000 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 456 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 457 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 458 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 460 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 462a | New Code | See Bill Text |
820 | 305 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 305 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 305 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 305 | 25.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 305 | 29.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 305 | 29.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
820 | 305 | 4e | New Code | See Bill Text |
820 | 305 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 305 | 8.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
820 | 305 | 8.1b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 305 | 8.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 305 | 8.2a | Amended Code | Citation Text |