IL SB2858 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on August 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1107
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on August 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1107
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Deposit of State Moneys Act. Provides that whenever the total amount of vouchers presented to the Comptroller exceeds the funds available in the general funds by $1,000,000,000 or more, the State Treasurer may invest or reinvest any State money in the Treasury which is not needed for current expenditures, or any money in the State Treasury which has been set aside and held for the payment of the principal of and the interest on any State bonds, in qualified account receivables under the Vendor Payment Program established by the Comptroller and the Department of Central Management Services. Provides that the State Treasurer shall be a qualified purchaser under the Vendor Payment Program and shall have priority over any other qualified purchasers when purchasing qualified account receivables. Provides that the interest penalty paid on any funds invested or reinvested by the State Treasurer under specified provisions shall be 0.3% per month or 0.01% per day.
Title
TREASURER-PERMITTED INVESTMENT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 39 N: 14 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 39 N: 14 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-27 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1107 |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Effective Date August 27, 2018 |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 049-001-000 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 006-002-000 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government |
2018-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 30, 2018 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2018-05-29 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2018-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-05-29 | House | Removed from Short Debate Status |
2018-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2018-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2018-05-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 009-002-000 |
2018-05-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-05-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2018-05-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris |
2018-05-18 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018 |
2018-05-14 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-25 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2018-04-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 039-014-003 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 006-002-000 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 520 | 22.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |