IL SB2858 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Deposit of State Moneys Act. Provides that whenever the total amount of vouchers presented to the Comptroller exceeds the funds available in the general funds by $1,000,000,000 or more, the State Treasurer may invest or reinvest any State money in the Treasury which is not needed for current expenditures, or any money in the State Treasury which has been set aside and held for the payment of the principal of and the interest on any State bonds, in qualified account receivables under the Vendor Payment Program established by the Comptroller and the Department of Central Management Services. Provides that the State Treasurer shall be a qualified purchaser under the Vendor Payment Program and shall have priority over any other qualified purchasers when purchasing qualified account receivables. Provides that the interest penalty paid on any funds invested or reinvested by the State Treasurer under specified provisions shall be 0.3% per month or 0.01% per day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TREASURER-PERMITTED INVESTMENT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 39 N: 14 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-05-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 009-002-000
2018-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-05-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2018-05-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-05-18HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-14HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-25HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-04-25HouseArrived in House
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-04-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 039-014-003
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-04-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-04-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-04-19SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2018-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018
2018-04-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateDo Pass State Government; 006-002-000
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to State Government
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-14SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-14SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1552022.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback