IL SB2857 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 25 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Treasurer Act. Amends the State Treasurer Act. Provides that the State Treasurer may retain an administrative charge for both the costs of services associated with the deposit of moneys that are remitted directly to the State Treasurer and the investment or safekeeping of funds by the State Treasurer. Provides that administrative charges from the investment or safekeeping of funds by the State Treasurer shall be charged no more than monthly and the total amount charged per fiscal year shall not exceed $12,000,000 plus any amounts required as employer contributions under specified statutory Sections. Provides that moneys in the State Treasurer's Administrative Fund are subject to appropriation by the General Assembly. Amends the State Treasurer's Bank Services Trust Fund Act. Provides that Moneys deposited in the State Treasurer's Bank Services Trust Fund shall be used by the State Treasurer to pay the cost of, among other banking services, operational expenses of the State Treasurer's Office related to the investment or safekeeping of funds under the Treasurer's control. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STATE TREASURER-ADMIN CHARGE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 72 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-25HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 072-038-000
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 006-001-000
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-25HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-04-25HouseArrived in House
2018-04-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 040-016-000
2018-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018
2018-04-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateDo Pass State Government; 006-002-000
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to State Government
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-14SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-14SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1550520Amended CodeCitation Text
3021210Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback