IL SB2853 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-21 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Professional Regulation Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Requires the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation to make available on its website general information on how the Department uses criminal history information in its decisions on licensure applications, including a list of enumerated offenses that bar licensure (rather than requiring the Department to have rules on how a person with criminal history would apply for a non-binding, advisory opinion from the Department as to whether his or her criminal history would bar licensure). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROF REG-CRIM HISTORY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-21SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-21HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-000-000
2018-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 007-000-000
2018-04-26HouseAssigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
2018-04-18HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-18HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-18HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2018-04-17HouseArrived in House
2018-04-17SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2018-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018
2018-04-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateDo Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 009-000-000
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-02-13SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-13SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-13SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2021052105-15Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback