IL SB2852 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Real Estate Appraiser Licensing Act of 2002 and Appraisal Management Company Registration Act. Provides that the Secretary of Financial and Professional Regulation may require participation in a third-party, multi-state licensing system for the licensing of certified general real estate appraisers, certified residential real estate appraisers, associate real estate trainee appraisers, and real estate appraisal education providers; and registration of appraisal management companies. Makes corresponding changes in both Acts. Provides that the multi-state licensing system may share regulatory information and maintain records in compliance with the provisions of the Acts. Provides that the multi-state licensing system may charge an applicant an administration fee that shall be paid directly to the system. Defines "multi-state licensing system". In provisions of the Real Estate Appraiser Licensing Act of 2002 concerning criminal history record checks, provides that the Secretary may designate a multi-state licensing system to perform the checks. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REAL ESTATE APPRAISERS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-30SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2018-05-18HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-09HouseTo Business Licenses Subcommittee
2018-05-07HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robert Rita
2018-04-26HouseAssigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
2018-04-17HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-17HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-17HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-04-17HouseArrived in House
2018-04-17SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2018-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018
2018-04-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateDo Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 011-000-000
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-02-13SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-13SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-13SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2254581-10Amended CodeCitation Text
22545820-10Amended CodeCitation Text
22545820-5Amended CodeCitation Text
2254585-10Amended CodeCitation Text
2254585-15Amended CodeCitation Text
2254585-20Amended CodeCitation Text
2254585-22Amended CodeCitation Text
2254585-25Amended CodeCitation Text
2254585-55Amended CodeCitation Text
2254585-7New CodeSee Bill Text
22545910Amended CodeCitation Text
22545932New CodeSee Bill Text
22545935Amended CodeCitation Text
22545940Amended CodeCitation Text
22545955Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback