IL SB2851 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Uniform Health Care Services Benefits Information Card Act. Includes dental service plans under the definition of "health benefit plan". Requires a uniform health care benefit information card or other technology for a dental service plan to include a statement that the dental service plan is fully insured. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INSURANCE CARD-DENTAL PLAN

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-30SenateSenate Concurs
2018-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 056-000-000
2018-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Insurance; 011-000-000
2018-05-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Insurance
2018-05-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 29, 2018
2018-05-25SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-05-25HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-002
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-15HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Insurance: Health & Life Committee; 015-000-000
2018-05-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Insurance: Health & Life Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-05-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance: Health & Life Committee
2018-05-11HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
2018-05-09HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Steven Reick
2018-05-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Steven Reick
2018-05-08HouseAssigned to Insurance: Health & Life Committee
2018-05-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-08HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-04HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-05-03HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2018-05-03HouseArrived in House
2018-05-02SenateThird Reading - Passed; 049-000-000
2018-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Althoff
2018-05-02SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommend Do Adopt Insurance; 012-000-000
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Insurance
2018-04-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-04-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateDo Pass as Amended Insurance; 014-000-000
2018-04-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2018-04-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Insurance
2018-04-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Insurance
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
2018-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Insurance
2018-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Insurance
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-03-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine
2018-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance
2018-02-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Insurance
2018-02-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-02-13SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-13SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-13SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21513910Amended CodeCitation Text
21513915Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2851&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2851.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2851eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2851enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2851sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2851sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2851sam003.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2851sam004.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2851ham001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB2851_05022018_001000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB2851_05252018_013000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB2851ham001_05302018_031000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback