IL SB2847 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Community College Act. Provides that a faculty or staff member of a community college is ineligible to serve as a member, elected or otherwise, of the board of trustees of the community college district in which the faculty or staff member is employed. Effective immediately.
Title
COMM COLL-STAFF-BOARD MEMBER
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Postponed - Higher Education |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Postponed - Higher Education |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 805 | 3-7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2847&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2847.htm |