IL SB2846 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Children and Family Services Act. Makes post-secondary education tuition and fee waivers available to youth for whom the Department of Children and Family Services has court-ordered legal responsibility, youth who aged out of care at age 18 or older, or youth formerly under care who have been adopted and were the subject of an adoption assistance agreement or who have been placed in private guardianship and were the subject of a subsidized guardianship agreement. Requires applicants to have earned a high school diploma from an accredited institution or a high school equivalency certificate or have met the State criteria for high school graduation before the start of the school year for which they are applying for the waivers. Limits the tuition and fee waivers to persons under the age of 26 and provides that waivers shall be available to a student for at least the first 5 years the student is enrolled in a community college, university, or college maintained by the State. Provides that the age requirement and 5-year cap on tuition and fee waivers shall be waived and eligibility extended for applicants or students who were unable to enroll in a qualifying post-secondary school or complete an academic term because the student: (i) was called into active duty with the United States Armed Forces; (ii) was deployed for service in the United States Public Health Service Commissioned Corps; or (iii) volunteered in the Peace Corps or the AmeriCorps. Permits the Department to provide the student with a stipend to cover maintenance and school expenses during the academic years to supplement the student's earnings. Requires the Department to develop outreach programs to ensure qualifying youths are aware of the availability of the tuition and fee waivers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DCFS-TUITION & FEE WAIVERS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee
2018-04-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-25HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-04-25HouseArrived in House
2018-04-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 040-015-000
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2018
2018-04-24SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2018-04-24SenateDo Pass as Amended Human Services; 006-002-000
2018-04-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-23SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2018-04-20SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-04-17SenatePostponed - Human Services
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-04-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-04-11SenatePostponed - Human Services
2018-03-14SenatePostponed - Human Services
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton
2018-02-27SenatePostponed - Human Services
2018-02-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2018-02-23SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Human Services
2018-02-13SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-13SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-13SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
205058Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback