IL SB2846 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Children and Family Services Act. Makes post-secondary education tuition and fee waivers available to youth for whom the Department of Children and Family Services has court-ordered legal responsibility, youth who aged out of care at age 18 or older, or youth formerly under care who have been adopted and were the subject of an adoption assistance agreement or who have been placed in private guardianship and were the subject of a subsidized guardianship agreement. Requires applicants to have earned a high school diploma from an accredited institution or a high school equivalency certificate or have met the State criteria for high school graduation before the start of the school year for which they are applying for the waivers. Limits the tuition and fee waivers to persons under the age of 26 and provides that waivers shall be available to a student for at least the first 5 years the student is enrolled in a community college, university, or college maintained by the State. Provides that the age requirement and 5-year cap on tuition and fee waivers shall be waived and eligibility extended for applicants or students who were unable to enroll in a qualifying post-secondary school or complete an academic term because the student: (i) was called into active duty with the United States Armed Forces; (ii) was deployed for service in the United States Public Health Service Commissioned Corps; or (iii) volunteered in the Peace Corps or the AmeriCorps. Permits the Department to provide the student with a stipend to cover maintenance and school expenses during the academic years to supplement the student's earnings. Requires the Department to develop outreach programs to ensure qualifying youths are aware of the availability of the tuition and fee waivers.
Title
DCFS-TUITION & FEE WAIVERS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-07 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-25 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-04-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 040-015-000 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Human Services; 006-002-000 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 505 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |