IL SB2844 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Chief House Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Requires the State Board of Education to establish and maintain the Growing Future Educators Program to train high school graduates who at one time have been identified as English learners and who are enrolled in an approved educator preparation program, among other qualifications, to become secondary language educators. Provides that each school district that chooses to participate in the Program shall partner with one public, regionally accredited institution of higher education in this State that offers a pre-approved educator preparation program and each qualified high school graduate participating in the program through the district must be enrolled at that institution in its educator preparation program. Provides that for each semester that a qualified high school graduate is participating in the program, the State Board shall issue the person a paraprofessional educator endorsement on an Educator License with Stipulations and the person must be employed as a part-time employee by the participating district as a paraprofessional working under the supervision of a district employee with a Professional Educator License. Sets forth provisions concerning funding, submitting program data, reporting to the General Assembly, and rulemaking. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-GROWING FUTURE EDUCATOR

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-24HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-04-24HouseArrived in House
2018-04-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 045-000-000
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Aquino
2018-04-23SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 012-000-000
2018-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2018-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateSecond Reading
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2018-02-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 28, 2018
2018-02-27SenateDo Pass Education; 009-000-000
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-02-23SenateSponsor Removed Sen. John F. Curran
2018-02-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2018-02-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-02-23SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2018-02-23SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Education
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2018-02-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-02-13SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-13SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-13SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10552-3.173New CodeSee Bill Text
105521B-20Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback