IL SB2840 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Enterprise Zone Act. Provides that enterprise zone applicants shall receive a specific score based on whether or not an applicant meets certain criteria (currently, the applicant receives a score based on the extent to which the applicant meets the criteria). Provides that the Enterprise Zone Board shall approve any application that receives at least 200 points, with the exception of a zone that has previously been decertified for cause. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ENTERPRISE ZONES-SCORING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-30SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2018-04-13SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Revenue
2018-02-13SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-13SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-13SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
206554.1Amended CodeCitation Text
206555.2.1Amended CodeCitation Text
206555.3Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback