IL SB2838 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-21 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Provides that, by January 1, 2019, the State Board of Education shall implement a program and adopt rules to allow school districts to supplement their substitute teacher recruitment for elementary and secondary schools with the use of recruiting firms. Defines "recruiting firm". Specifies program requirements. Prohibits school districts from using recruiting firms to circumvent collective bargaining agreements or laws. Amends the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that the term "teacher" or "substitute teacher" does not include and service credit may not be granted to an individual employed by an entity that provides substitute teaching services under the program and is not a school district. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-THIRD PARTY SUB TEACHER

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 009-000-000
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2018-04-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 050-003-000
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Link
2018-04-25SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 010-000-000
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018
2018-04-23SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
2018-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018
2018-03-14SenateDo Pass Education; 009-000-000
2018-03-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-02-27SenatePostponed - Education
2018-02-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2018-02-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Education
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-02-13SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-13SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-13SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10552-3.173New CodeSee Bill Text
40516-106Amended CodeCitation Text
40516-106.3Amended CodeCitation Text
40516-127Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback