IL SB2838 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-8)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Provides that, by January 1, 2019, the State Board of Education shall implement a program and adopt rules to allow school districts to supplement their substitute teacher recruitment for elementary and secondary schools with the use of recruiting firms. Defines "recruiting firm". Specifies program requirements. Prohibits school districts from using recruiting firms to circumvent collective bargaining agreements or laws. Amends the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that the term "teacher" or "substitute teacher" does not include and service credit may not be granted to an individual employed by an entity that provides substitute teaching services under the program and is not a school district. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-THIRD PARTY SUB TEACHER

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-29SenateSent to the Governor
2018-06-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 054-000-000
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 007-000-000
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government
2018-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2018-05-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2018-05-30SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2018-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Terry Link
2018-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 30, 2018
2018-05-30SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
2018-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-05-30HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto
2018-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2018-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 008-000-000
2018-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2018-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-05-24HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 009-000-000
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2018-04-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 050-003-000
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Link
2018-04-25SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 010-000-000
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018
2018-04-23SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
2018-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018
2018-03-14SenateDo Pass Education; 009-000-000
2018-03-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-02-27SenatePostponed - Education
2018-02-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2018-02-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Education
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-02-13SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-13SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-13SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10552-3.173New CodeSee Bill Text
40516-106Amended CodeCitation Text
40516-106.3Amended CodeCitation Text
40516-127Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2838&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2838.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2838eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2838enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2838sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2838ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2838ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB2838_04252018_024000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB2838_05302018_012000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB2838ham002_05312018_049000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback