IL SB2838 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-8)
Status: Passed on August 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1049
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-8)
Status: Passed on August 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1049
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that, by January 1, 2019, the State Board of Education shall implement a program and adopt rules to allow school districts to supplement their substitute teacher recruitment for elementary and secondary schools with the use of recruiting firms. Defines "recruiting firm". Specifies program requirements. Prohibits school districts from using recruiting firms to circumvent collective bargaining agreements or laws. Amends the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that the term "teacher" or "substitute teacher" does not include and service credit may not be granted to an individual employed by an entity that provides substitute teaching services under the program and is not a school district. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-THIRD PARTY SUB TEACHER
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-23 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1049 |
2018-08-23 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-23 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-06-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 054-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 007-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Terry Link |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 30, 2018 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2018-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2018-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-05-30 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2018-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2018-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2018-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2018-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 008-000-000 |
2018-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2018-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2018-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2018-05-24 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2018-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 009-000-000 |
2018-05-07 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-003-000 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Link |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 010-000-000 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 009-000-000 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 2-3.173 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 16-106 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 16-106.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 16-127 | Amended Code | Citation Text |