IL SB2838 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-22 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that a person operating a vehicle of the second division weighing more than 8,000 pounds upon a highway of this State shall remove any ice and snow from the hood, roof, and sides of the vehicle that poses a threat to the safety of other persons or property on the highway during operation of the vehicle.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-TRUCKS-ICE/SNOW

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-22SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2016-04-22SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2016-04-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Transportation
2016-04-13SenatePostponed - Transportation
2016-04-12SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
2016-04-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2016-04-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2016-04-08SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 22, 2016
2016-04-06SenatePostponed - Transportation
2016-03-01SenateAssigned to Transportation
2016-02-17SenateReferred to Assignments
2016-02-17SenateFirst Reading
2016-02-17SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
625511-1413.5New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback