IL SB2835 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-05 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0740
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-05 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0740
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Includes highways on public school property in the classification of non-designated highways. Requires vehicles to stop before meeting or overtaking, from either direction, any school bus stopped on a public school highway.
Title
VEH CD-PUBLIC SCHOOL HIGHWAYS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-05 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0740 |
2016-08-05 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2017 |
2016-08-05 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2016-05-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2016-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-18 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 007-000-000 |
2016-05-13 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2016 |
2016-05-09 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2016-04-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-22 | House | First Reading |
2016-04-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2016-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Manar |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 018-000-000 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2016 |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 5, 2016 |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 018-000-000 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 1-126.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 11-1414 | Amended Code | Citation Text |