IL SB2834 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Alcoholism and Other Drug Abuse and Dependency Act. Changes the short title of the Act to the Substance Use Disorder Act. Removes the terms "addict", "addiction", "alcoholic", "alcoholism", and "substance abuse" and their corresponding definitions. Requires the Department of Human Services to reduce the incidence of substance use disorders (rather than reduce the incidence and consequences of the abuse of alcohol and other drugs). Defines "substance use disorder". Requires the Department to design, coordinate, and fund prevention, early intervention, treatment, and other recovery support services for substance use disorders that are accessible and address the needs of at-risk individuals and their families. Requires the Department to develop a comprehensive plan on the provision of such services; assist other State agencies in developing and establishing substance use disorder services for the agencies' clients; adopt medical and clinical standards on how to determine a substance use disorder diagnosis; and other matters. Contains provisions concerning the licensing of substance use disorder treatment providers; licensure categories and services; the identification of individuals who need substance use disorder treatment using "SBIRT"; patients' rights; services for pregnant women, mothers, and criminal justice clients; and other matters. Repeals a provision of the Act establishing the Committee on Women's Alcohol and Substance Abuse Treatment. Repeals a provision of the Act setting forth the powers and duties of the Medical Advisory Committee. Makes conforming changes concerning the Substance Use Disorder Act to several Acts including the Department of Human Services Act, the Children and Family Services Act, and the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Administrative Act. Effective January 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SUBSTANCE USE DISORDER ACT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-27HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-27HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-27HouseArrived in House
2018-04-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Syverson
2018-04-25SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 008-000-000
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass Human Services; 007-000-000
2018-03-14SenatePostponed - Human Services
2018-02-27SenatePostponed - Human Services
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Human Services
2018-02-13SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-13SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-13SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105522-30Amended CodeCitation Text
2013051-40Amended CodeCitation Text
20130510-15Amended CodeCitation Text
20130510-66Amended CodeCitation Text
20134010Amended CodeCitation Text
20134015Amended CodeCitation Text
20134020Amended CodeCitation Text
20134025Amended CodeCitation Text
20170510Amended CodeCitation Text
20170518.6Amended CodeCitation Text
2026052605-54Amended CodeCitation Text
2026052605-97Amended CodeCitation Text
2026302.1Amended CodeCitation Text
2026305.2Amended CodeCitation Text
2026353Amended CodeCitation Text
203011-1Amended CodeCitation Text
203011-10Amended CodeCitation Text
203011-5Amended CodeCitation Text
2030110-10Amended CodeCitation Text
2030110-15Amended CodeCitation Text
2030110-20Repealed CodeCitation Text
2030110-25Repealed CodeCitation Text
2030110-30Repealed CodeCitation Text
2030110-35Amended CodeCitation Text
2030110-5Amended CodeCitation Text
2030110-55Repealed CodeCitation Text
2030110-60Repealed CodeCitation Text
2030115-10Amended CodeCitation Text
2030115-5Amended CodeCitation Text
2030120-10Amended CodeCitation Text
2030120-15Amended CodeCitation Text
2030120-5Amended CodeCitation Text
2030125-10Amended CodeCitation Text
2030125-15Amended CodeCitation Text
2030125-20Amended CodeCitation Text
2030125-5Amended CodeCitation Text
2030130-5Amended CodeCitation Text
2030135-10Amended CodeCitation Text
2030135-5Amended CodeCitation Text
2030140-10Amended CodeCitation Text
2030140-15Amended CodeCitation Text
2030140-5Amended CodeCitation Text
2030145-5Amended CodeCitation Text
203015-10Amended CodeCitation Text
203015-20Amended CodeCitation Text
203015-23Amended CodeCitation Text
203015-5Amended CodeCitation Text
2030150-10Amended CodeCitation Text
2030150-20Amended CodeCitation Text
2030150-40Amended CodeCitation Text
2030155-25Amended CodeCitation Text
2030155-30Amended CodeCitation Text
20301Act titleAmended CodeCitation Text
20301Art. 40 headingAmended CodeCitation Text
205055Amended CodeCitation Text
210853Amended CodeCitation Text
2155367d.1Amended CodeCitation Text
225103Amended CodeCitation Text
225108Amended CodeCitation Text
2258519.1Amended CodeCitation Text
307325Amended CodeCitation Text
30554-8Amended CodeCitation Text
30554-9Amended CodeCitation Text
30555-5Amended CodeCitation Text
30556-1.3Amended CodeCitation Text
30556-11Amended CodeCitation Text
30559-9Amended CodeCitation Text
30559A-8Amended CodeCitation Text
32557.3bAmended CodeCitation Text
32558.2Amended CodeCitation Text
40510515Amended CodeCitation Text
40510525Amended CodeCitation Text
40510535Amended CodeCitation Text
4051055Amended CodeCitation Text
405302Amended CodeCitation Text
405303Amended CodeCitation Text
405304Amended CodeCitation Text
40551-129Amended CodeCitation Text
4102104Amended CodeCitation Text
5070510.18Amended CodeCitation Text
507057Amended CodeCitation Text
5074012.5Amended CodeCitation Text
507408Amended CodeCitation Text
5513010Amended CodeCitation Text
5513015Amended CodeCitation Text
5513040Amended CodeCitation Text
5555-1103Amended CodeCitation Text
601190-10Amended CodeCitation Text
60130-145Amended CodeCitation Text
7054054-3Amended CodeCitation Text
7054055-615Amended CodeCitation Text
7054055-710Amended CodeCitation Text
720529B-1Amended CodeCitation Text
720570302Amended CodeCitation Text
720570411.2Amended CodeCitation Text
720570501Amended CodeCitation Text
72064680Amended CodeCitation Text
73053-19-10Amended CodeCitation Text
73053-19-5Amended CodeCitation Text
73053-6-2Amended CodeCitation Text
73053-8-5Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-2-6Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-4.5-95Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-5-3Amended CodeCitation Text
73558-2002Amended CodeCitation Text
740407Amended CodeCitation Text
745353Amended CodeCitation Text
7454936Amended CodeCitation Text
7454970Amended CodeCitation Text
7509065Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback