IL SB2830 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Election Code. Requires that the trustees for the Fox Metro Water Reclamation District be elected at consolidated elections. Provides that where a nomination for election is to be made for a trustee of the Fox Metro Water Reclamation District, then the petition shall be filed in the office of the county clerk not more than 113 nor less than 106 days prior to the date of the primary. Amends the Sanitary District Act of 1917. Provides that the board of trustees of the Fox Metro Water Reclamation District shall be elected (rather than appointed) beginning with the 2019 election. Sets forth requirements concerning the number of trustees to be elected and length of terms. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FOX METRO WATER RECLAMATION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 66 N: 49 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-24SenateGovernor Vetoed
2018-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-30HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-05-30HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Sue Scherer
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 066-049-000
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elections & Campaign Finance Committee; 010-005-000
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-25HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-04-25HouseArrived in House
2018-04-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-001-000
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass Government Reform; 006-002-000
2018-02-28SenatePostponed - Government Reform
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Government Reform
2018-02-13SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-13SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-13SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1052A-41Amended CodeCitation Text
1057-12Amended CodeCitation Text
7024053Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback