IL SB2828 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Provides that any contract entered into between a specified State agency and a contractor for the provision of professional or technical services in excess of $100,000 shall require a contractor to use software to verify that hours billed for work under the contract for services performed on a computer are legitimate. Provides that the contract shall specify that the State agency will not pay for hours worked on a computer, unless those hours are verifiable by the software or by data collected by the software. Provides for the required functions of the software to be used. Requires a contractor to store data collected by the software for 7 years, and to retrieve and make available that data to a State agency upon request. Provides that a contractor shall not charge the State agency, or an auditor of the agency, for access to or use of the work verification software, or for access to or retrievals of data collected by the software. Provides that these provisions shall apply to all applicable contracts entered into on and after the effective date of this amendatory Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROCURMNT-WORK VERIFY SOFTWARE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-30SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2018-04-13SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-12SenateTo Subcommittee on Governmental Operations
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Executive
2018-02-13SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-13SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-13SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3050035-45New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback