IL SB2827 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that drugs prescribed to residents of the following facilities are not subject to prior approval as a result of the 4-prescription limit: long-term care facilities as defined in the Nursing Home Care Act; community-integrated living arrangements as defined in the Community-Integrated Living Arrangements Licensure and Certification Act; and supportive living facilities as defined in the Code.
Title
MEDICAID-EXCEPTION TO RX LIMIT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 007-000-000 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-5.12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2827&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2827.htm |