IL SB2825 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that it is a violation for a person not entitled to the possession of a vehicle or essential part of a vehicle to receive, possess, conceal, sell, dispose, or transfer it with the intent to permanently or temporarily deprive the owner of his or her title to or possession of the vehicle. Deletes language providing that it may be inferred that a person exercising exclusive unexplained possession over a stolen or converted vehicle or an essential part of a stolen or converted vehicle has knowledge that such vehicle or essential part is stolen or converted. Provides instead that the trier of fact may infer that a person intends to permanently or temporarily deprive the owner of his or her title to or possession of the vehicle if the person: (i) operates a vehicle or possesses an essential part of a vehicle without the consent of the owner; or (ii) exercises exclusive unexplained possession over a vehicle or an essential part of a vehicle.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-FELONIES-STOLEN VEHICLE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-02-27SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2018-02-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2018-02-14SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2018-02-13SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-13SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-13SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62554-103Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback