IL SB2819 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Employee Health Savings Account Law. Provides that each employer under the Act may (rather than shall) make available to each eligible individual a health savings account program, if that individual chooses to enroll in the program. Provides that an employer who makes a health savings account program available may make an annual contribution, in an amount determined by the employer, into an eligible individual's health savings account. Removes language requiring an employer to annually deposit an amount equal to one-third of the annual deductible into an eligible individual's health savings account. Makes conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STATE HEALTH SAVINGS ACCOUNT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateDo Pass State Government; 006-000-000
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to State Government
2018-02-13SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-13SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-13SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
537710-10Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback