IL SB2818 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that the posting of bail by a defendant shall not be a factor when considering if he or she qualifies for the appointment of a Public Defender. Defines "indigent". Effective immediately.
Title
CRIM PRO-INDIGENT DEFENDANTS
Sponsors
Sen. Elgie Sims [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 007-003-000 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 28, 2018 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 007-003-000 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
725 | 5 | 102-11.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
725 | 5 | 113-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |