IL SB2812 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-03 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Motor Vehicle Theft Prevention Act. Eliminates references to the Illinois Criminal Justice Information Authority within the Act. Provides that money in the Motor Vehicle Theft Prevention Trust Fund shall be used to pay the administrative costs to support the Illinois Motor Vehicle Theft Prevention Council, not to exceed 10% in any one fiscal year of other amounts collected under the Act (currently, to pay the Authority's costs to administer the Council). Requires the Trust Fund to be administered by a statewide association representing property and casualty insurance companies that pay into the Trust Fund (instead of the Executive Director of the Authority). Makes changes to the purpose of the Act and to the powers of the Illinois Motor Vehicle Theft Prevention Council. Provides that moneys in the State Police Motor Vehicle Trust Fund shall be used by the Department of State Police for motor vehicle fraud prevention purposes in addition to motor vehicle theft prevention purposes. Makes conforming changes. Effective July 1, 2017.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MOTOR VEHICLE THEFT PREVENTION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-03HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2016-11-29HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2016-11-29HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2016-11-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2016-11-29HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 008-004-000
2016-11-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote
2016-11-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2016-11-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2016-11-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2016-11-22HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2016-04-21HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2016-04-21HouseFirst Reading
2016-04-21HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2016-04-21HouseArrived in House
2016-04-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2016-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2016
2016-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2016-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 7, 2016
2016-04-06SenateDo Pass Insurance; 011-000-000
2016-03-01SenateAssigned to Insurance
2016-02-17SenateReferred to Assignments
2016-02-17SenateFirst Reading
2016-02-17SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2040052Amended CodeCitation Text
2040053Amended CodeCitation Text
2040054Amended CodeCitation Text
2040056Repealed CodeCitation Text
2040057Amended CodeCitation Text
2040058Amended CodeCitation Text
2040058.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback