IL SB2804 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Aeronautics Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

NEW HARMONY BRIDGE COMPACT ACT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 013-000-000
2018-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-05-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2018-05-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David B. Reis
2018-05-14HouseAssigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2018-05-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-10HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-10HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis
2018-05-10HouseArrived in House
2018-05-10SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Righter
2018-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Withdrawn by Sen. Dale A. Righter
2018-05-10SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Transportation
2018-05-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 017-000-000
2018-05-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter
2018-05-03SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Transportation
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter
2018-04-12SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Dale A. Righter
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-11SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2018-04-11SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateDo Pass Executive; 009-000-000
2018-02-20SenateAssigned to Executive
2018-02-13SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-13SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-13SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. William E. Brady

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
620582Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback