IL SB2801 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on January 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1121
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on January 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1121
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends Public Act 102-698 by adding appropriations to the Department of Employment Security for specified purposes. Effective immediately.
Title
$STATE APPELLATE DEFENDER
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Holmes [D] | Sen. Don Harmon [D] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] | Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] |
Rep. Gregory Harris [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-01-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-23 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1121 |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Effective Date January 23, 2023 |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2023-01-10 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-000 |
2023-01-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-01-06 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-01-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-01-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-01-05 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 014-000-000 |
2022-12-30 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2022-12-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris |
2022-12-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-12-01 | House | First Reading |
2022-12-01 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2022-12-01 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 046-009-000 |
2022-12-01 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Holmes |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Linda Holmes |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-07-16 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 10, 2021 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2021 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Do Pass Appropriations; 008-004-000 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |