IL SB2800 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that beginning January 1, 2025, renal dialysis services provided within a skilled nursing facility by a certified home dialysis provider shall receive a per-claim add-on payment of $95 per treatment. Defines "certified home dialysis provider" to mean an end stage renal disease facility that (i) provides dialysis treatment or dialysis training to caregivers or individuals with end stage renal disease and (ii) has been approved to provide dialysis home training support services by the federal Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services. Effective January 1, 2025.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DHFS-RENAL DIALYSIS PAYMENTS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2025-01-07SenateSession Sine Die
2024-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2024-04-05SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
2024-03-15SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024
2024-03-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2024-01-31SenateAssigned to Appropriations - Health and Human Services
2024-01-17SenateReferred to Assignments
2024-01-17SenateFirst Reading
2024-01-17SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30555-5.08aNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback