IL SB2800 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Makes various appropriations and reappropriations for specified purposes. Amends Public Act 101-637 by changing and adding various appropriations. Some provisions are effective immediately; some provisions are effective July 1, 2021.
Title
$STATE APPELLATE DEFENDER
Sponsors
Sen. Don Harmon [D] | Sen. Elgie Sims [D] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] | Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] |
Rep. Gregory Harris [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-16 - House - Motion in House (Y: 71 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 36 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 72 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 37 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 37 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 39 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 36 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 72 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 37 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 37 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 39 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-17 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0017 |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Effective Date June 17, 2021; Some Provisions Effective July 1, 2021. |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Governor Certifies Changes |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Returned to Governor for Certification |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Both Houses Accepted Amendatory Veto |
2021-06-16 | House | Accept Amendatory Veto - House Passed 071-044-001 |
2021-06-16 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2021-06-16 | House | Placed on Standard Debate |
2021-06-15 | House | Amendatory Veto Motion - Accept Motion Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-002-000 |
2021-06-15 | House | Amendatory Veto Motion - Motion Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-06-15 | House | Amendatory Veto Motion - Motion Filed Accept Amendatory Veto Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2021-06-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto |
2021-06-15 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Verified |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Accept Amendatory Veto - Senate Passed 036-021-000 |
2021-06-15 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Amendatory Veto Motion - Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Amendatory Veto Motion - Motion Referred to Assignments |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Amendatory Veto Motion - Motion Filed Accept Amendatory Veto Sen. Don Harmon |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Governor Amendatory Veto |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Motion Withdrawn Sen. Don Harmon |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Sen. Don Harmon |
2021-06-01 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2021-06-01 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 037-021-000 |
2021-06-01 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 3/5 Vote Required |
2021-06-01 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 037-021-000 |
2021-06-01 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 3/5 Vote Required |
2021-06-01 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-06-01 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-06-01 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2021-06-01 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Don Harmon |
2021-06-01 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2021-06-01 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Don Harmon |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 3, 2 - June 1, 2021 |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2, 3 |
2021-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2021-05-31 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 072-044-001 |
2021-05-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2021-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2021-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 072-045-000 |
2021-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2021-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-002-000 |
2021-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Greg Harris |
2021-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2021-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Greg Harris |
2021-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 009-006-000 |
2021-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2021-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Greg Harris |
2021-05-28 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-28 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-27 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-27 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 008-006-000 |
2021-05-27 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 070-045-000 |
2021-05-27 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2021-05-27 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-05-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-27 | House | First Reading |
2021-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris |
2021-05-27 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2021-05-27 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 039-017-000 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 10, 2021 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2021 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Do Pass Appropriations; 008-004-000 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |