IL SB2799 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on January 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0921
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Employment Security Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois and the Department of Labor Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department of Employment Security rather than the Department of Labor shall monitor the employment progress of women and minorities in the workforce and report to the General Assembly. Amends the Nurse Agency Licensing Act. Requires the nurse agency to check the Health Care Worker Registry (rather than contact the Department of Public Health) before employing, assigning, or referring a certified nurse aide to verify that the certified nurse aide is eligible to be hired by health care employers or long-term care facilities pursuant to the Health Care Worker Background Check Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EMPLOYMENT-NURSE AGENCY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-01-10 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-10 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-13SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0921
2017-01-13SenateGovernor Approved
2017-01-12SenateSent to the Governor
2017-01-10SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-01-10SenateSenate Concurs
2017-01-10SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-01-10SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 056-000-000
2017-01-10SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 056-000-000
2017-01-10Senate3/5 Vote Required
2017-01-10SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-01-10SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-01-10SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2017-01-10SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-01-10SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2017-01-10SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-01-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - January 10, 2017
2017-01-10SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
2017-01-10HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
2017-01-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-01-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-01-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 024-000-000
2017-01-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. Andrew F Skoog
2017-01-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
2017-01-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-01-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen
2017-01-09SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-01-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-01-09HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-01-09HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Lou Lang
2017-01-09HouseFiscal Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Lou Lang
2017-01-03HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2016-12-01HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2016-12-01HouseFiscal Note Filed
2016-11-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Andrew F Skoog
2016-11-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Andrew F Skoog
2016-11-29HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2016-11-29HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2016-11-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2016-11-29HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 015-004-000
2016-11-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Labor & Commerce Committee; by Voice Vote
2016-11-29HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Lou Lang
2016-11-29HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Lou Lang
2016-11-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
2016-11-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2016-11-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen
2016-11-14HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2016-04-21HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2016-04-21HouseFirst Reading
2016-04-21HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2016-04-21HouseArrived in House
2016-04-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2016-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 20, 2016
2016-04-19SenateSecond Reading
2016-04-06SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2016-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 7, 2016
2016-04-06SenateDo Pass Labor; 009-000-000
2016-03-25SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2016-03-01SenateAssigned to Labor
2016-02-17SenateReferred to Assignments
2016-02-17SenateFirst Reading
2016-02-17SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Dan Duffy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2010051005-45Amended CodeCitation Text
20100543a.06Amended CodeCitation Text
2015051505-20Amended CodeCitation Text
20150543.13Amended CodeCitation Text
22551013Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2799&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=88&GA=99
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB2799.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB2799eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB2799enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB2799ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB2799ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/99/senate/09900SB2799_04212016_021000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/99/house/09900SB2799_01102017_003000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/99/senate/09900SB2799_01102017_001001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/99/senate/09900SB2799_01102017_001000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback