IL SB2797 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on August 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0902
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on August 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0902
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Provides that a craft distiller license allows the manufacture of up to 100,000 gallons (instead of 35,000 gallons) of spirits by distillation per year and the storage of those spirits. Provides that a craft distiller license holder may store those spirits at a non-contiguous licensed location, but at no time shall a craft distiller license holder, or any subsidiary or affiliate thereof, or any officer, associate, member, partner, representative, employee, agent, or shareholder of that craft distiller license holder directly or indirectly produce in the aggregate more than 100,000 gallons of spirits per year. Requires a craft distiller to affirm in its application that it does not produce more than 100,000 gallons of distilled spirits annually and that it does not sell more than 2,500 gallons of spirits to non-licensees. Prohibits craft distillers from being affiliated with directly or indirectly any other alcoholic liquor manufacturer licensed by any licensing authority. Prohibits distributors, importing distributors, and retailers from being licensed as a craft distiller. Amends the Video Gaming Act. In the definition of "licensed establishment", provides that "licensed establishment" does not include the premises of any manufacturer's licensee, wine maker's premises licensee, or brew pub licensee and adds a cross-reference to a provision in the Liquor Control Act of 1934 that describes a retailer's license. Effective immediately.
Title
LIQUOR-CRAFT DISTILLERS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-26 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0902 |
2016-08-26 | Senate | Effective Date August 26, 2016 |
2016-08-26 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2016-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 055-000-000 |
2016-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 011-000-000 |
2016-05-27 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive |
2016-05-27 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-27 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 29, 2016 |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2016-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2016-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2016-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2016-05-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-26 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2016-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2016-05-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-002-000 |
2016-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2016-05-19 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-19 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2016-05-02 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2016-04-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-21 | House | First Reading |
2016-04-21 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2016-04-21 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2016 |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 7, 2016 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Reported Back To Executive; 003-000-000 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2016-03-02 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (EX) |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
230 | 40 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
235 | 5 | 5-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
235 | 5 | 6-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |