IL SB2789 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the County Jail Good Behavior Allowance Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

JUV CT-EXPUNGEMENT-RECORDS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-23HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-15HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000
2018-05-08HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-05-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-08HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-02HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2018-05-02HouseArrived in House
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2018-05-01SenateThird Reading - Passed; 046-000-004
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Rose
2018-05-01SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 007-001-003
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2018-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose
2018-04-19SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Chapin Rose
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateDo Pass Executive; 009-000-000
2018-02-20SenateAssigned to Executive
2018-02-13SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-13SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-13SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. William E. Brady

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7301301Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback