IL SB2787 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
CRIMINAL LAW-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-07-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John F. Curran |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 009-000-000 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. William E. Brady |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 1-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |