IL SB2783 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0577
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0577
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Uniform Disposition of Unclaimed Property Act. Decreases the duration from 7 years to 5 years for unclaimed property held by any federal, State, local government or governmental entity to be presumed abandoned.
Title
UNCLAIMED PROPERTY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-15 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0577 |
2016-07-15 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2017 |
2016-07-15 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2016-06-10 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-12 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2016-05-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-04 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 007-000-000 |
2016-04-18 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2016-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-15 | House | First Reading |
2016-04-15 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2016-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-001-000 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 16, 2016 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2016 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
765 | 1025 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
765 | 1025 | 8.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |