IL SB2780 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $59,200,000 to the Department of Human Services for various purposes concerning community-integrated living arrangements. Effective immediately.
Title
$DHS COMMUNITY LIVING
Sponsors
Sen. Heather Steans [D] | Sen. Linda Holmes [D] | Sen. Robert Martwick [D] | Sen. Dave Syverson [R] |
Sen. Robert Peters [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations I |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2780&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/PDF/10100SB2780.pdf |