IL SB2779 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Enrolled on January 13 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-13 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 13 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-13 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Park District Code. Provides that the 3 2-member districts of the Fox Valley Park District shall be referred to as subdistricts. Provides that the subdistrict commissioners shall reside within the subdistrict from which he or she is elected. Adds nominating petition requirements for subdistrict commissioners and the at-large commissioner. Makes other changes.
Title
FOX VALLEY PARK DIST-VARIOUS
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Holmes [D] | Rep. Barbara Hernandez [D] | Rep. Stephanie Kifowit [D] | Rep. Keith Wheeler [R] |
Sen. Karina Villa [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-01-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2021-01-13 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-000 |
2021-01-13 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-01-13 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2021-01-12 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Linda Holmes |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - January 12, 2021 |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2021-01-12 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2021-01-11 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2021-01-11 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2021-01-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-01-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2021-01-08 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-01-08 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-01-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-01-08 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 013-000-000 |
2021-01-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2021-01-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2021-01-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-01-02 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2020-10-06 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2020-10-06 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2020-10-06 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2020-10-06 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Removed Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2020-03-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2020-03-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-04 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2020-03-04 | House | Arrived in House |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 25, 2020 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 20, 2020 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 018-000-000 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 1205 | 2-17.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |