IL SB2773 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code, Township Code, and Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that a disabled veteran or his or her caregiver shall not be charged any building permit fee for improvements to the residence of the disabled veteran if the improvements are required to accommodate a service-connected disability. Provides that required paperwork to obtain a building permit shall still be submitted. Limits home rule powers. Effective January 1, 2021.
Title
LOCAL-DISABLED VET PERMIT FEE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-03-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-04 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2020-03-04 | House | Arrived in House |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 25, 2020 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 20, 2020 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 009-000-000 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 5-12022 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 1 | 110-17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 11-13-28 | New Code | See Bill Text |