IL SB2773 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0980
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Governmental Ethics Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROPERTY ASSESSED CLEAN ENERGY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 70 N: 43 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-19SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0980
2018-08-19SenateEffective Date January 1, 2019
2018-08-19SenateGovernor Approved
2018-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2018-06-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2018-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 070-043-002
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2018-05-22HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-05-08HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-05-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-08HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-03HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2018-05-03HouseArrived in House
2018-05-02SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2018-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Althoff
2018-05-02SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Sponsor Changed to Sen. Pamela Althoff
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-04-26SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Commerce and Economic Development; 009-000-000
2018-04-25SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Commerce and Economic Development
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-04-13SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateDo Pass Executive; 009-000-000
2018-02-20SenateAssigned to Executive
2018-02-13SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-13SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-13SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. William E. Brady

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
54201-101Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback