IL SB2772 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Arthritis Prevention, Control, and Cure Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LOW THC HEMP EXTRACT ACT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-04-25HouseArrived in House
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-04-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018
2018-04-23SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Anderson
2018-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Agriculture; 008-000-000
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture
2018-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-04-05SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateDo Pass Executive; 009-000-000
2018-02-20SenateAssigned to Executive
2018-02-13SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-13SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-13SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. William E. Brady

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41021Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback