IL SB2769 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code. Provides that a sheriff shall enter upon the duties of his or her office on the December 1 following his or her election (rather than on the first day in the month of December following his or her election on which the office of the sheriff is required, by statute or by action of the county board, to be open).
Title
SHERIFF-COMMENCEMENT OF DUTIES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve McClure |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Brian W. Stewart |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 27, 2020 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 009-000-000 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve McClure |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 3-6002 | Amended Code | Citation Text |