IL SB2762 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning instruction.
Title
EDUCATION-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 27-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |