IL SB2760 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Act on the Aging. In provisions concerning the Community Care Program (program), removes from the list of program services clearinghouse information provided by senior citizen home owners who want to rent rooms to or share living space with other senior citizens. In a provision requiring the Department on Aging to perform certain actions to increase the effectiveness of the program, removes a requirement that the Department ensure the determination of need tool is accurate in determining program participants' level of need. In a provision concerning pre-service certification for in-home workers who provide housekeeping or home aide services, requires employing agencies to pay wages to in-home workers for pre-service and in-service training. Provides that the Department may authorize (rather than shall delay) program services until an applicant is determined eligible for medical assistance under the Illinois Public Aid Code. Removes a provision requiring the Department to implement co-payments under the program. Requires the Department to make annual (rather than quarterly) reports on care coordination unit performance and adherence to service guidelines. Removes expired rate levels. Requires the Department to pay an enhanced rate under the Community Care Program to those in-home service provider agencies that offer health insurance coverage as a benefit to their direct service worker employees. Provides that all final administrative decisions of the Department are subject to judicial review. Makes other changes.
Title
AGING-COMMUNITY CARE PROGRAM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2024-06-26 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2024-05-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 26, 2024 |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2024 |
2024-05-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 24, 2024 |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 17, 2024 |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 10, 2024 |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 30, 2024 |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 18, 2024 |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Health and Human Services; 009-002-000 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Health and Human Services |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 19, 2024 |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Postponed - Health and Human Services |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024 |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Health and Human Services |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-01-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 105 | 3.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 105 | 4.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 105 | 4.02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 105 | 5.03 | New Code | See Bill Text |