IL SB2751 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-01 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0621
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-01 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0621
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes. Requires a veteran or caregiver to provide proof of veteran status and attest to the fact that the improvements to the residence are required to accommodate the veteran's disability. Provides that proof of veteran status is to be construed liberally, and veteran status shall include service in the Armed Forces of the United States, National Guard, or the reserves of the Armed Forces of the United States. Provides that what constitutes proof of veteran status shall be determined by the county, township, or municipality. Prohibits the Illinois Department of Veterans' Affairs from adjudicating any dispute arising under the provisions. Removes the effective date.
Title
LOCAL-DISABLED VET PERMIT FEE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-01 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0621 |
2024-07-01 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2025 |
2024-07-01 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2024-06-13 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2024-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2024-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson |
2024-05-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2024-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicole La Ha |
2024-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2024-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt |
2024-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer |
2024-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs |
2024-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal |
2024-05-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-05-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-05-01 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-30 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Veterans' Affairs Committee; 012-000-000 |
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2024-04-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-12 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2024-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andrew S. Chesney |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 010-000-000 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 20, 2024 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 007-000-000 |
2024-02-06 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Removed Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-01-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 5-12022 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 1 | 110-17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 11-13-28 | New Code | See Bill Text |